+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Public Act 15-197
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 901
- Senate Calendar Number 600
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7827
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Veterans' Affairs
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Veterans' Affairs
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- File Number 287
- House Calendar Number 183
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 10:00 AM
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 459 PASS
- Yeas: 36
May 26, 2015: House Roll Call Vote 217 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 147
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Program Review and Investigations Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor