+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- File Number 233
- House Calendar Number 164
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/15 5:00 PM
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/24
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
General Law Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor