+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- File Number 883
- Senate Calendar Number 573
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7588
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Commerce
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Commerce
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- File Number 178
- House Calendar Number 124
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/24
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Banking
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 20, 2015: House Roll Call Vote 175 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 141
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Banking Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor