+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 12, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Special Act 19-22
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 989
- Senate Calendar Number 608
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9397
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 686
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 422
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/27
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor