+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Special Act 15-14
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 620
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Passed
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- File Number 57
- House Calendar Number 66
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/15 5:00 PM
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/13
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2015: Senate Roll Call Vote 434 PASS
- Yeas: 36
May 29, 2015: House Roll Call Vote 271
- Yeas: 140
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsor
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor