+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- File Number 1001
- Senate Calendar Number 627
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9551
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Public Health
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Public Health
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 685
- House Calendar Number 421
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing 03/25
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vote to Draft
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Change of Reference to Government Administration and Elections
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor