+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-159
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 868
- Senate Calendar Number 653
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7541
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 742
- House Calendar Number 521
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 10:00 AM
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 04/15
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 462 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
May 24, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 277 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 131
- Absent: 19
+ − Sponsors (6)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor