+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Recommitted to Judiciary
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 867
- Senate Calendar Number 657
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7444
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Environment
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Environment
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 698
- House Calendar Number 481
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/13 5:00 PM
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 04/05
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
May 23, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 256 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 23
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsors (37)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor