+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 30, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 21, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 18, 2021 in the House:
- Public Act 21-111
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- House Passed
- Emergency Certification
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor