+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 633
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8788
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- File Number 730
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/15 5:00 PM
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- File Number 362
- House Calendar Number 219
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/15 5:00 PM
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/06
- Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
+ − Amendments (15)
+ − Vote
May 30, 2015: House Roll Call Vote 290 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 133
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsor
Transportation Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor