+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 865
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 658
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 7644
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7618
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Education
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Education
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 734
- House Calendar Number 513
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 10:00 AM
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 04/05
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
May 23, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 270 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 20
- Absent: 16
+ − Sponsor
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor