+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-210
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 888
- Senate Calendar Number 678
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8221
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 6555
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 637
- House Calendar Number 425
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/25
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 5, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 571 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
May 30, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 309 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 119
- Nays: 26
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (18)
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor