+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- File Number 512
- House Calendar Number 379
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM
On April 1, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/26
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Sponsor
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor