+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-155
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 856
- Senate Calendar Number 650
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7546
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety and Security
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 694
- House Calendar Number 477
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/13 5:00 PM
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/22
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 461 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
May 22, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 234 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 132
- Absent: 18
+ − Sponsors (28)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor