+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 12, 2013 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-309
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule B
On June 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 696
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On June 1, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 8496
- Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 7625
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
- No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 693
- House Calendar Number 476
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/13 5:00 PM
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 04/01
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 5, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 617 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
June 1, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 333 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 138
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (4)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor