+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-209
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 877
- Senate Calendar Number 671
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7663
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- File Number 727
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/13 10:00 AM
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 474
- House Calendar Number 311
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/22
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 530 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
May 28, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 284 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 141
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (15)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor