+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (33)
On July 12, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-308
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 706
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8664
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 475
- House Calendar Number 309
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/19
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
June 5, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 620 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
June 4, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 369 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 147
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (36)
Commerce Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor