+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- File Number 790
- Senate Calendar Number 555
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9852
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- File Number 551
- House Calendar Number 395
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/21 5:00 PM
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/22
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor