+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-154
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule B
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 827
- Senate Calendar Number 615
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 6457
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 7046
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 7037
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 692
- House Calendar Number 475
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/13 5:00 PM
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 04/01
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 479 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
May 15, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 166 HOUSE AMD C
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 77
- Absent: 11
May 15, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 167 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 116
- Nays: 24
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (17)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor