+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 410
- House Calendar Number 277
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/12
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor