+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 377
- House Calendar Number 257
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/12
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Sponsors (4)
Human Services Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor