+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 28, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 18, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Public Act 21-94
On June 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- File Number 778
- Senate Calendar Number 542
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9634
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- File Number 212
- House Calendar Number 183
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 5:00 PM
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/09
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Commerce Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor