+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 12, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Act 13-21
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Matter Pass Retained
- Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- Senate Calendar Number 485
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 588
- House Calendar Number 403
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/13 10:00 AM
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/18
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
+ − Votes (2)
June 5, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 605 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
May 1, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 70
- Yeas: 143
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (4)
Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor