+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- File Number 168
- House Calendar Number 111
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/17
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor