+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- File Number 531
- New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 5, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 5:00 PM
On April 3, 2023 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 28, 2023 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 157
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 123
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/23 5:00 PM
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 2, 2023 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 3, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/07
On February 2, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
+ − Sponsor
Housing Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor