+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-152
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 826
- Senate Calendar Number 614
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6769
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 634
- House Calendar Number 422
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/13
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 456 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
May 15, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 180 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 132
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 17
+ − Sponsors (12)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor