+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 7, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-180
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 8610
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On June 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 895
- Senate Calendar Number 687
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 8456
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8418
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 8444
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 467
- House Calendar Number 303
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Votes (6)
June 4, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 527 PASS
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 1
June 3, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 526 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 8610
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 1
June 1, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 326 HOUSE AMD A
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 47
- Absent: 21
June 1, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 327 HOUSE AMD B
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 82
- Absent: 21
June 1, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 328 HOUSE AMD C
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 82
- Absent: 22
June 1, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 329 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 59
- Absent: 20
+ − Sponsors (6)
Government Administration and Elections Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor