+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-151
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar
- Senate Passed
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 633
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 531
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 341
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 5:00 PM
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 459 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
May 20, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 211
- Yeas: 140
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (26)
Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor