+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Act 13-3
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 644
- Senate Calendar Number 469
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6139
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 550
- House Calendar Number 349
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/13 5:00 PM
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/18
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 255 PASS
- Yeas: 36
April 24, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 66 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 136
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (10)
Planning and Development Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor