+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-28
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 508
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 633
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 421
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/13 5:00 PM
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 259 PASS
- Yeas: 36
May 1, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 84
- Yeas: 143
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (20)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor