+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 684
- House Calendar Number 420
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/15
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor