+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Act 13-13
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 819
- Senate Calendar Number 604
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6910
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 233
- House Calendar Number 176
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/12
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 468 PASS
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 2
May 14, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 153 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 55
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (25)
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor