+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 840
- Senate Calendar Number 632
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7296
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 781
- House Calendar Number 540
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/08/13 5:00 PM
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Vote
May 20, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 218 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 136
- Absent: 14
+ − Sponsors (2)
Human Services Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor