+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-90
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
- No New File by Committee on Human Services
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Joint Favorable
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 804
- Senate Calendar Number 584
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6759
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 465
- House Calendar Number 301
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/15
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 399 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
May 9, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 144 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 135
- Absent: 15
+ − Sponsors (26)
Environment Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor