+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- File Number 522
- House Calendar Number 328
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/15 5:00 PM
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/17
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Vote to Draft
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor