+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-202
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 686
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 464
- House Calendar Number 300
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Transportation
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Transportation
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Change of Reference Transportation
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/07
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 5, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 573 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
May 30, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 308
- Yeas: 146
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (23)
Commerce Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor