+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (40)
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 7, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-183
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- In Concurrence
- House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
On June 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8508
- Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
- Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
On June 1, 2013 in the House:
- Potential Disagreeing Action, Tabled for the Calendar, House
On June 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 863
- Senate Calendar Number 662
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7848
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Public Health
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Public Health
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 229
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 172
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
June 3, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 351 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 134
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 13
June 1, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 513 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
May 24, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 278 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 29
+ − Sponsors (66)
Children Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor