+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-201
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules
- House Passed
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 708
- Rules Suspended
- Senate Passed
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 665
- House Calendar Number 458
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/13 5:00 PM
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
June 5, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 565 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
June 4, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 384
- Yeas: 132
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 9