+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-144
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 559
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 689
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 472
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/13 5:00 PM
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/11
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 452 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
May 7, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 98
- Yeas: 142
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (6)
Judiciary Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor