+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-89
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 8095
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 8080
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 8077
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8030
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 8078
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 854
- Senate Calendar Number 647
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7655
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 7653
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 7717
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- File Number 368
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- House Calendar Number 248
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/13 5:00 PM
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/08
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
+ − Amendments (44)
+ − Votes (10)
May 30, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 398 PASS
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 16
- Absent: 1
May 29, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 394 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 8030
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 1
May 29, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 393 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 8078
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 1
May 29, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 395 ADOPT SENATE AMD C LCO 8077
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 2
May 29, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 396 ADOPT SENATE AMD D LCO 8080
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 1
May 29, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 397 ADOPT SENATE AMD E LCO 8095
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 1
May 23, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 249 HOUSE AMD C
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 81
- Absent: 23
May 23, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 250 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 55
- Absent: 21
May 23, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 248 HOUSE AMD B
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 83
- Absent: 18
May 23, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 247 HOUSE AMD A
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 59
- Absent: 15
+ − Sponsors (11)
Transportation Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor