+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 221
- House Calendar Number 164
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (4)
Children Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor