+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Special Act 13-12
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 793
- Senate Calendar Number 569
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6425
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 407
- House Calendar Number 274
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/15
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 454 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
May 8, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 120 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 139
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (18)
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor