+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-142
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 619
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 7156
- House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 7148
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
- No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 528
- House Calendar Number 338
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 5:00 PM
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/15
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 481 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
May 15, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 178
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 39
- Absent: 17
+ − Sponsors (12)
Public Health Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor