+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 12, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-289
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On June 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 891
- Senate Calendar Number 688
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
On May 31, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8245
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 219
- House Calendar Number 162
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/13 5:00 PM
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 5, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 595 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
May 31, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 322 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 138
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsors (6)
Insurance and Real Estate Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor