+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Special Act 21-8
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 492
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Passed
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- File Number 266
- House Calendar Number 220
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/04
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Labor and Public Employees Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor