+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-119
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 833
- Senate Calendar Number 627
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6956
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Judiciary
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 406
- House Calendar Number 260
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/13 10:00 AM
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 03/05
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 402 PASS
- Yeas: 32
- Absent: 4
May 16, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 196 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 135
- Absent: 15
+ − Sponsors (9)
Energy and Technology Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor