+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- File Number 282
- House Calendar Number 188
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Favorable Substitute
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Drafted by Committee
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/14
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor