+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-45
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Concurrence
- Senate Passed
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 7221
- Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 7102
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Calendar Number 335
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 138
- House Calendar Number 120
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 10:00 AM
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/28
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
May 16, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 316 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 7102
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 21
May 16, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 317 ADOPT SENATE AMD B LCO 7221
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 22
May 16, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 318
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 14
April 10, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 40
- Yeas: 143
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsors (14)
Commerce Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor