+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-114
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 802
- Senate Calendar Number 587
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5971
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- No New File by Committee on Human Services
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Human Services
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 43
- House Calendar Number 71
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/18/13 10:00 AM
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/26
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Children
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 419 PASS
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 2
May 9, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 133 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 41
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsors (24)
Children Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor