+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to the Secretary of State
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act 13-200
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
- Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- File Number 853
- Senate Calendar Number 645
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
- House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7230
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Appropriations
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Tabled for the Calendar, House
- No New File by Committee on Transportation
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
- Joint Favorable
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred by House to Committee on Transportation
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- File Number 92
- House Calendar Number 90
- Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
- Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/13 5:00 PM
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Joint Favorable
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing 02/28
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2013: Senate Roll Call Vote 547 PASS
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 1
May 22, 2013: House Roll Call Vote 242 AS AMENDED
- Yeas: 144
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (37)
Public Safety and Security Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor